Fasten up your calculations using principles of Vedic Maths

by Pravin Sharma



Trick 1 : Multiply any two numbers from 11 to 20 in your head.
Take 15 × 13 for example… Place the larger no. first in your mind and then do something like this Take the larger no on the top and the second digit of the smaller no. in the bottom.
15
3
The rest is quite simple. Add 15+3 = 18 . Then multiply 18 × 10 = 180 …
Now multiply the second digit of both the no.s (ie; 5 × 3 = 15) Now add 180 + 15. Here is the answer 180 + 15 = 195 . Think over it. This is a simple trick. It will help you a lot.



Trick 2
: Multiply any two digit number with 11.
This trick is much simpler than the previous one and it is more useful too. Let the number be 27 . Therefore 27 × 11
Divide the number as 2 _ 7
Add 2+ 7 = 9
Thus the answer is 2 9 7
Wasn't this one simple. But there is one complication. If you take a number like 57 Thus _57 x 11
Divide the number as 5 _ 7
Add 5 + 7 = 12
Now add 1 to 5 and place 2 in the middle so the answer is 5+1_2 _7 = _627
Thus the answer is 627.

Trick 3
: Multiply any number from 1 to 10 by 9 To multiply by 9, try this:

(1) Spread your two hands out and place them on a desk or table in front of you.

(2) To multiply by 3, fold down the 3rd finger from the left. To multiply by 4, it would be the 4th finger and so on.

(3) the answer is 27 … READ it from the two fingers on the left of the folded down finger and the 7 fingers on the right of it. This one was really cool wasn't it.


Trick 4: Square a two digit number ending in five. This one is as easy as the previous ones but you have to pay a little more attention to this one . Read carefully :Let the number be 35
35 × 35
Multiply the last digits of both the numbers ; thus ___ 5 × 5 = 25
now add 1 to 3 thus 3 + 1 = 4
multiply 4 × 3 = 12
thus answer 1225

You will have to think over this one carefully.As 5 has to come in the end so the last two digits o the answer will be 25 . Add 1 to the first digit and multiply it by the original first digit . Now this answer forms the digits before the 25. Thus we get an answer.

Trick 5 : Square any two digit number.

Suppose the number is 47 . Look for the nearest multiple of 10 . ie; in this case 50. We will reach 50 if we add 3 to 47. So multiply (47+3) x (47-3) = 50 × 44 = 2200 This is the 1st interim answer.


We had added 3 to reach the nearest multiple of 10 that is 50 thus 3x 3 = 9 This is the second interim answer.


The final answer is 2200 + 9 = 2209 … Practice This one on paper first.

Trick 6
: Multiply any number by 11 .

Trick number 2 tells you how to multiply a two digit number by 11 but what if you have a number like 12345678. Well that is very easy if you our trick as given below. Read it carefully.


Let the number be 12345678 __ thus 12345678 × 11


Write down the number as 012345678 ( Add a 0 in the beginning)

Now starting from the units digit write down the numbers after adding the number to the right, so the answer will be 135802458

This one is simple if you think over it properly all you got to do is to add the number on the right . If you are getting a carry over then add that
to the number on the left. So I will tell you how I got the answer . Read carefully. The number was 12345678 ___ I put a 0 before the number ____ so the new number 012345678 Now I wrote ___ 012345678


Then for the answer


8 + 0 = 8

7 + 8 = 15 (1 gets carry carried over)

6+1+7 = 14 ( 1 gets carried over)

5 + 1 + 6 = 12 ( 1 gets carried over)

4 + 1 + 5 = 10 ( 1 gets carried over)

3 + 1 + 4 = 8

2 + 3 = 5

1 + 2 = 3

0 + 1 = 1

Thus the answer = 135802458

Trick 7 : Square a 2 Digit Number, for this example 37:
Look for the nearest 10 boundary
In this case up 3 from 37 to 40.
Since you went UP 3 to 40 go DOWN 3 from 37 to 34.
Now mentally multiply 34×40
The way I do it is 34×10=340;
Double it mentally to 680
Double it again mentally to 1360
This 1360 is the FIRST interim answer.
37 is "3" away from the 10 boundary 40.
Square this "3" distance from 10 boundary.
3×3=9 which is the SECOND interim answer.
Add the two interim answers to get the final answer.
Answer: 1360 + 9 = 1369

With practice this can easily be done in your head.

I hope you enjoyed this post.Please dont forget to rate this!


48 Comments
    kashishsehgal
    Vote
    Current Rating
    0
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    kashishsehgalTue, 02 Sep 2014 03:28:38 -0000

    Re-commenting-

    http://www.magicved.com/tricks/

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    kashishsehgal
    Vote
    Current Rating
    0
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    kashishsehgalTue, 02 Sep 2014 03:23:43 -0000

    Thanks for sharing these tricks Pravin! If anyone want more tricks, you can get them at-

    'http://learnhub.com/redirect?u=http%3A//www.magicved.com/tricks/':http://www.magicved.com/tricks/

    Don't forget to share your views!

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    kashishsehgal
    Vote
    Current Rating
    0
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    kashishsehgalTue, 02 Sep 2014 03:22:46 -0000

    Thanks for sharing these tricks Pravin! If anyone want more tricks, you can get them at-

    link

    Don't forget to share your views!

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    kashishsehgal
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    kashishsehgalTue, 02 Sep 2014 03:20:27 -0000

    Thanks for sharing these tricks Pravin! If anyone want more tricks, you can get them at-

    link

    Don't forget to share your views!

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    Anu Teja
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    Anu TejaMon, 25 Aug 2014 10:08:42 -0000

    sir ,
    I want some more tricks in maths
    plz plz plz plz send my Email

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    VIDHU440
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    VIDHU440Mon, 11 Aug 2014 06:21:56 -0000

    I have one more trick related to trick-6. Suppose you have to multiply 3467×11, then, 3467
    +34670
    38137 is the answer.

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    stdof72
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    stdof72Mon, 04 Aug 2014 14:45:48 -0000

    isi ko kahte hain india is country of rishi with atharvaveda maths

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    Rahul Kirar
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    Rahul KirarThu, 26 Jun 2014 10:10:40 -0000

    That can vedas do,Salute to indian real history and culture

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    Ike C Patricks
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    Ike C PatricksTue, 25 Feb 2014 07:56:56 -0000

    Well I was a slow mathematician, and I was always searching for easier and faster way of solving before I stumble tout this one. It changéd My speed of calculation.

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    rumali
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    rumaliTue, 18 Feb 2014 03:16:11 -0000

    yeah, fucking awesome!

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    kanhakhemkha
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    kanhakhemkhaMon, 30 Sep 2013 07:01:23 -0000

    now it is very easy for me to do calculation

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    AMIT KUMAR123
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    AMIT KUMAR123Sat, 10 Aug 2013 06:40:44 -0000

    ammazing……………………………

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    sathya_007
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    sathya_007Sat, 29 Jun 2013 14:18:07 -0000

    This is totally superbb…….
    made my calculations easier.
    thanks

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    saswata_bh
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    saswata_bhSun, 09 Jun 2013 02:55:54 -0000

    yes, it's true using vedic concept to solve a given problem is really very nice. But it needs much practice, else it might be time taking process rather than simply implying arithmatic rule.

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    djaditya
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    djadityaThu, 25 Apr 2013 04:17:10 -0000

    Hats…..off!!!!!!!!
    No words to say
    Awesome!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!…………….

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    saisanthosh
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    saiMon, 17 Jan 2011 15:01:52 -0000

    awesome!!!!

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    DKTE
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    Nitin Satish KabraWed, 17 Feb 2010 04:55:51 -0000

    These tricks are classic!!!!

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    gowda
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    chandanTue, 12 Jan 2010 08:07:29 -0000

    mindblowing,awesome , fantastic,,
    no more words 2 say.
    tnkx

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    thinks only
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    thinks onlySun, 03 Jan 2010 15:54:46 -0000

    nice……….

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    Swarn
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    SwarnTue, 15 Dec 2009 20:40:00 -0000

    Its easy and fun.Moreover,it saves a lot of time but it needs thorough practice.

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    Rahul porwal
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    Rahul porwalThu, 26 Nov 2009 09:01:14 -0000

    liked first and sixth trick most………..as i knew rest……….thank you veery much for the tricks………if possible add some more

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    Rahul porwal
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    Rahul porwalThu, 26 Nov 2009 08:39:49 -0000

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    piyaa
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    piyaWed, 07 Oct 2009 04:36:28 -0000

    REALLY
    GREAT…..
    could u post more tricks of these kinds ??

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    conquer
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    Prathmesh Anant MiseTue, 22 Sep 2009 14:18:52 -0000

    man……SO SIMPLE

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    vinutanm
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    vinutanmThu, 10 Sep 2009 14:21:21 -0000

    these are really very useful

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    jddas
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    JOYDEEP DASThu, 27 Aug 2009 09:30:19 -0000

    really unbelievable!how did u came to know about these tricks?whatever….i think it will help us to perform larger calculations within a short span of time.

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    mystudents
    Vote
    Current Rating
    0
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    Tue, 23 Jun 2009 15:41:32 -0000

    really.. helpful… hey guys there is a book of vedic mathematics.. available in d market where u can find many of these tricks..

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    djchalil
    Vote
    Current Rating
    0
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    Dijesh ChalilWed, 17 Jun 2009 03:38:45 -0000

    These are really very useful in calculating big numbers. But keep in mind, it needs practice. Otherwise you will end up taking more time than usual in the examination hall. Use it after thorough practice. It will be of great help.

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    Akhilesh
    Vote
    Current Rating
    1
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    Thu, 11 Jun 2009 16:57:07 -0000

    THESE TRICKS ARE REALLY GREAT

    Post Comments

    Reply to This
    Vashu
    Vote
    Current Rating
    0
    Rate Up
    Rate Down
    Sun, 07 Jun 2009 18:30:40 -0000

    Try "Vedic Mathematics" by Dhaval Bathia!!

    Post Comments

    Reply to This

Your Comment

Avatar
Vote
Current Rating
0
Rate Up
Rate Down
Have an account? Log In

Textile is Enabled. View Reference.